Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cipriano Sánchez Varela

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1776Born
25 May 182649.6SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Jul 182649.7ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Oct 182650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
13 Mar 184871.4DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Sánchez Varela
Bishop Cipriano Sánchez Varela (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo del Escorial

  • a bishop for 21.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 309
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 782
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast