Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maputo

Archidioecesis Maputensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 18 September 1976
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Mozambique
  • Square Kilometers: 26,358 (10,180 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesedemaputo.org/
  • Mailing Address: Paco Arquiepeiscopal, Avenida Eduardo Mondlane 1448, Maputo, Mocambique
  • Telephone: 21.32.62.40
  • Fax: 21.32.18.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Mozambico
21 January 1612ErectedDiocese of São Tomé e Príncipe Apostolic Administration of Mozambico (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Mozambico
1783ElevatedApostolic Administration of Mozambico Territorial Prelature of Mozambico
4 September 1940Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Mozambico (Zambézia (Beira, Tete, and Quelimane)) Diocese of Beira (erected)
4 September 1940Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Mozambico (Niassa (Mocambique and Pòrto Amelia)) Diocese of Nampula (erected)
Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
4 September 1940ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Mozambico (Sui do Save (Lourenço Marques and Inhambane)) Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
3 August 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Lourenço Marques (Inhambane) Diocese of Inhambane (erected)
19 June 1970Territory LostArchdiocese of Lourenço Marques (Gaza) Diocese of João Belo (erected)
Archdiocese of Maputo
18 September 1976Name ChangedArchdiocese of Lourenço Marques Archdiocese of Maputo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
1949104,7701,290,3158.1%2441651,6112114531ap1951
1970442,8181,396,55131.7%128952231,98513942459ap1971
Archdiocese of Maputo
1980289,648908,22631.9%537426,8965111040ap1981
1990304,7001,019,00029.9%865734,1739722640ap1991
1999475,0003,850,00012.3%19891084,39811818939ap2000
2000475,0003,850,00012.3%23891124,24111818939ap2001
2001476,0003,859,00012.3%18891074,44811818939ap2002
2002464,0003,859,00012.0%18891074,33612418941ap2003
2003675,0003,850,00017.5%1969887,67012521040ap2004
2004675,0003,850,00017.5%2159808,43711521440ap2005
20131,134,0004,661,00024.3%29568513,34123214744ap2014
20161,223,0003,040,00040.2%34649812,47917214744ap2017
20191,323,0003,288,80040.2%26689414,07422614846ap2020
20211,482,7003,685,43540.2%386810613,98722614846ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 33, Page 14, to Page 18
  • Archdiocese of Maputo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 629, and Page 630

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 19 May 2024