Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Juliasse Ferreira Sandramo

Auxiliary Bishop of Maputo, Mozambique

Titular Bishop of Arsennaria

Apostolic Administrator of Pemba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1968 Born
28 Jun 199830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chimoio, Mozambique
7 Dec 201850.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maputo, Mozambique
7 Dec 201850.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
17 Feb 201950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsennaria
11 Feb 202152.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pemba, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for António Juliasse Ferreira Sandramo
Bishop António Juliasse Ferreira Sandramo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Maputo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoalpo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chimoio, Diocese of Chimoio

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Maputo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 17 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,101
  • ab: CB, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast