Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Goiás

Dioecesis Goiasensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Goiânia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 20,784 (8,027 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Dr. Joaquim Rodrigues s/n, C.P. 05, 76600-000 Goias, GO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (062)3371-1206
  • Fax: 3371-2380

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Goiás
6 December 1745ErectedDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Goiás (erected)
Diocese of Mariana (erected)
Diocese of São Paulo (erected)
Diocese of Goiás
15 July 1826ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Goiás Diocese of Goiás
27 April 1892Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Goiás (from São Salvador da Bahia)
1 May 1906Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Goiás (from São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro)
29 September 1907Territory LostDiocese of Goiás Diocese of Uberaba (erected)
20 December 1915Territory LostDiocese of Goiás Diocese of Porto Nacional (erected)
25 July 1924Territory LostDiocese of Goiás Territorial Prelature of São José de Alto Tocantins (erected)
21 June 1929Territory LostDiocese of Goiás Territorial Prelature of Jataí (erected)
Archdiocese of Goiás
18 November 1932ElevatedDiocese of Goiás Archdiocese of Goiás
26 March 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiás
Territorial Prelature of São José de Alto Tocantins (suppressed)
Territorial Prelature of Formosa (erected)
Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu) (erected)
26 March 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiás Archdiocese of Goiânia (erected)
Diocese of Goiás
26 March 1956ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Bananal (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Goiás
Diocese of Goiás (Archdiocese to Diocese)
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia
Diocese of Goiás
Diocese of Jataí
Territorial Prelature of São Luís de Montes Belos (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostDiocese of Goiás
Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu)
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Goiás
1950800,0001769869,3028937ap1951
Diocese of Goiás
1966252,760.0%13720014ap1967
1967291,572.0%2111320135512ap1971
1976310,000350,00088.6%2052512,40064519ap1977
1980268,000300,00089.3%1472112,76175716ap1981
1990334,000376,00088.8%10122215,181123418ap1991
1999402,000437,00092.0%15142913,862154520ap2000
2000407,000442,00092.1%14112516,280124520ap2001
2001205,596288,39871.3%1410248,566104720ap2002
2002205,596223,42692.0%1412267,907125120ap2004
2004206,600222,19193.0%1212248,6082164021ap2005
2006208,000224,39592.7%1611277,7032133621ap2007
2013228,000244,00093.4%259346,7056113422ap2014
2016231,600250,00092.6%245297,9861062224ap2017
2019210,400227,50992.5%275326,575952524ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast