Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Romita

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1880Born
22 Mar 191736.5AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
15 Apr 191736.5Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
14 Oct 193959.0DiedBishop of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Romita
Bishop Alberto Romita (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano-Campobasso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeglie del Campo
Ordained BishopModugno, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast