Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Sep 1971 | Born | ||
18 Mar 1997 | 25.4 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy |
30 Aug 1997 | 25.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy |
5 Oct 2003 | 32.0 | Solemn Vows | Priest of Order of Friars Minor |
11 Aug 2022 | 50.8 | Appointed | Patriarchal Vicar |
9 Jan 2024 | 52.2 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine |
9 Jan 2024 | 52.2 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Astigi |
16 Mar 2024 | 52.4 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Astigi |
(VIAF: 58158185827920062857; WikiData: Q124218499)
Bishop
Bruno
Varriano
O.F.M.
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo, Brazil |
Ordained Bishop | Filoxenia Conference Center, Nicosia, Archdiocese of Cipro (Maronite) |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 1 Apr 2024 |
✠