Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ceuta

Dioecesis Septensis

United

To: Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ceuta
4 April 1417ErectedDiocese of Marrakesh Diocese of Ceuta (erected)
1459Territory LostDiocese of Ceuta
Diocese of Marrakesh
Diocese of Tanger (Tangier) (erected)
Diocese of Ceuta and Tanger
9 June 1570UnitedDiocese of Ceuta
Diocese of Tanger (Tangier)
Diocese of Ceuta and Tanger
Diocese of Ceuta
16 December 1675Name ChangedDiocese of Ceuta and Tanger Diocese of Ceuta
5 September 1851UnitedDiocese of Cádiz
Diocese of Ceuta
Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ceuta
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 125
  • Diocese of Ceuta
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 25
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
    Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

    Quantcast