Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Mayoral Alonso de Mella

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1685³Born
9 Apr 173145.3AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
16 Sep 173145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
27 Jan 173852.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
31 Mar 173852.3InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
6 Oct 176983.8DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Mayoral Alonso de Mella
Archbishop Andrés Mayoral Alonso de Mella (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolacillos
Ordained BishopSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 50, Number 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 376, and Page 430
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,088
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,647
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast