Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivan Šarić

Deceased

Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1871Born
20 Jul 189422.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
22 Jul 189422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
27 Apr 190836.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
27 Apr 190836.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
28 May 190836.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
2 May 192250.5AppointedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
16 Jul 196088.8DiedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Ivan Šarić
Archbishop Ivan Šarić (born , died ) Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTravnik

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 52.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 100
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 857, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast