Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Yu Chengxin

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1927Born
10 Dec 198153.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 198961.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
2007²79.0RetiredCoadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
7 Dec 201789.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Yu Chengxin
Bishop Matthias Yu Chengxin (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYüjiawan, District of Hantai

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2018, Page 1,136
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast