Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Conrado Walter, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1923Born
2 Dec 195633.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
1 Dec 197754.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
1 Dec 197754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
2 Feb 197854.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia
9 Jun 198258.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
26 Nov 198461.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
10 Aug 199168.1SucceededBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
5 Jul 200077.0RetiredBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
20 Sep 201895.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Conrado Walter
Bishop Conrado Walter S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jacarezinho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBichishausen, Germany
Ordained BishopCornélio Procópio, Diocese of Cornélio Procópio, Parana
Death PlaceJacarezinho, Diocese of Jacarezinho, Parana
Buried Place (Original)Nossa Senhora de Guadalupe, Church, Jacarezinho, Diocese of Jacarezinho, Parana

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Mar 2021

Quantcast