Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquim Gonçalves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1917Born
8 Dec 194124.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 195133.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
22 Aug 195133.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helos
8 Dec 195134.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helos
15 Dec 195134.1AppointedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
14 Mar 195739.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Mar 195739.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
14 Jun 197355.6AppointedBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
13 Oct 197355.9InstalledBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
28 Mar 197961.4ResignedBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
23 Jun 198870.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Joaquim Gonçalves
Bishop José Joaquim Gonçalves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaboticabal
Ordained BishopSáo José, Cathedral, Rio Preto, Diocese of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo
Death PlaceDiocese of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast