Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Vũ Ðnh Hiệu

Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1954 Born
22 Jan 199944.2Ordained PriestPriest of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam
25 Jul 200954.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xun Lộc, Viet Nam
25 Jul 200954.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
10 Oct 200954.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna
24 Dec 201258.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
17 Aug 201358.7SucceededBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Thomas Vũ Ðnh Hiệu
Bishop Thomas Vũ Ðnh Hiệu (born ) Bishop of Bi Chu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNinh My

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bi Chu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,312
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2012
  • s: CB, 17 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Mar 2021

Quantcast