Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bi Chu

Dioecesis Buichuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of H Nội
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 1,350 (521 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://gpbuichu.org
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, Xuan Ngoc, Xuan Truong, Nam Dinh, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (0350)3887.514
  • Fax: 3887.521

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}
5 September 1848ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu
9 March 1936Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu (Nam-Dinh (Thai-Binh, Humg-Yen, and Nam-Dinh)) Vicariate Apostolic of Thi Binh (erected)
Diocese of Bi Chu
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu Diocese of Bi Chu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu
1950190,329697,00927.3%17391821,04530115305ap1951
Diocese of Bi Chu
1963165,000950,00017.4%30305,500190117ap1991
1999355,8641,100,25032.3%49497,262327130ap2000
2000349,0001,120,00031.2%47477,425371130ap2001
2001361,7331,138,27031.8%52526,956432129ap2002
2003371,5001,350,00027.5%74745,020421129ap2004
2004380,1301,336,40028.4%58586,553475129ap2005
2006386,1481,428,65827.0%831844,5971502129ap2007
2012381,9061,879,00020.3%1631632,342735173ap2013
2015398,0841,218,10032.7%801051852,151105842175ap2016
2018409,5501,250,18632.8%1041072111,940110913176ap2019
2020417,1851,274,46732.7%113972101,986971,021180ap2021
2022427,5051,283,91033.3%213142271,883261,132183ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 124
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 25, and Page 26
  • Diocese of Bi Chu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 346, to Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024