Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Carmelo Cardinal de Vasconcellos Motta

Deceased

Archbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1890Born
29 Jun 191827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Jul 193242.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Jul 193242.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Algiza
30 Oct 193242.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Algiza
1933²42.4AppointedAdministrator of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1934²43.4CeasedAdministrator of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Dec 193545.4AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1940²49.4AppointedAdministrator of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
1944²53.4ResignedAdministrator of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
13 Aug 194454.0AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
18 Feb 194655.5Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194655.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
19 Apr 195867.7AppointedAdministrator of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Apr 196473.7AppointedArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Sep 198292.1DiedArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Carmelo de Vasconcellos Motta (VIAF: 202332488)
Carlos Carmelo Cardinal de Vasconcellos Motta (born , died ) Archbishop of Aparecida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Jesus do Amparo, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão José, Church, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais
Death PlaceSanta Casa de Misericórdia, Aparecida, Archdiocese of Aparecida, Sao Paulo
Buried Place (Original)Chapel do Santíssimo, Cathedral, Aparecida, Archdiocese of Aparecida, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.8 years
  • a cardinal for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 78
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 648, Ascendance
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast