Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio dos Santos Cabral

Deceased

Archbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1884Born
1 Nov 190723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
1 Sep 191732.8AppointedBishop of Natal, Brazil
14 Apr 191833.5Ordained BishopBishop of Natal, Brazil
21 Nov 192137.1AppointedBishop of Belo Horizonte, Brazil
30 Apr 192237.5InstalledBishop of Belo Horizonte, Brazil
1 Feb 192439.3AppointedArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Nov 196783.1DiedArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio dos Santos Cabral
Archbishop Antônio dos Santos Cabral (born , died ) Archbishop of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlacePropriá

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 83
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 648, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast