Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria Ungarelli, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Azura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1897Born
22 Dec 192831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Nov 194851.5AppointedPrelate of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
13 Nov 194851.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Azura
27 Mar 194951.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azura
1 Mar 197577.8RetiredPrelate of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
23 May 198891.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Ungarelli
Bishop Alfonso Maria Ungarelli M.S.C. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Pinheiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarrara, Italy
Ordained BishopReine de la Paix, Church, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 648
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast