Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Colturato, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Botucatu, Brazil

Note/Previous Titular See: (Luiz Maria de Sant'Anna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1886Born
6 Mar 190922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Aug 192943.3AppointedBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
4 Oct 192943.5Ordained BishopBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
12 Apr 193852.0AppointedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
5 May 194660.1DiedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antonio Colturato
Bishop Antonio Colturato O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Botucatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Anna dei Boschi, Italy

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast