Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Delmotte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1892Born
28 Oct 191927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
24 Jan 194047.3AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
7 Mar 194047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
8 Jul 194552.8ResignedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
8 Jul 194552.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
29 Aug 195764.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Louis Delmotte
Bishop Louis Delmotte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHennuyères

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast