Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Pierre-Albert Wittebols, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1912Born
11 Jul 193725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
10 Mar 194936.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Mar 194936.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
16 Jun 194937.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
10 Nov 195947.5AppointedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Nov 196452.6DiedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Pierre-Albert Wittebols
Bishop Joseph-Pierre-Albert Wittebols S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Wamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtterbeck, Belgium
Ordained BishopSacred Heart Chapel, St. Quentin, Brussels, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceWamba, Diocese of Wamba

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 42
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 447
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast