Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie Himmer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1902Born
15 Aug 192624.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 194846.7AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
24 Feb 194946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
2 Jul 197775.2RetiredBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
11 Jan 199491.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie Himmer (VIAF: 165645512)
Bishop Charles-Marie Himmer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDinant

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast