Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brian Udaigwe

Apostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka

Titular Archbishop of Suelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1964 Born
13 Apr 199126.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Orlu, Nigeria
2 May 199227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Orlu, Nigeria
22 Feb 201348.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Suelli
22 Feb 201348.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio
8 Apr 201348.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
27 Apr 201348.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Suelli
16 Jul 201348.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
13 Jun 202055.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Brian Udaigwe
Archbishop Brian Udaigwe (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sri Lanka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiko, Cameroon
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sri Lanka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Apr 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,776
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast