Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Tshomba Shamba Kotsho

Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Oescus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1963 Born
1 Aug 199027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202057.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202057.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
10 Oct 202057.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus

MicroData Summary for Vincent Tshomba Shamba Kotsho
Bishop Vincent Tshomba Shamba Kotsho (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame du Congo, Cathedral, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Ordained BishopGrounds of, l'Institut Technique de la Gombe, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • c3: CB, 10 Oct 2020
  • c4: CB, 11 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast