Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Tinoudji

Bishop of Pala, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1973 Born
8 Jan 200531.4Ordained PriestPriest of Moundou, Chad
3 Jul 202147.9AppointedBishop of Pala, Chad
2 Oct 202148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pala, Chad

MicroData Summary for Dominique Tinoudji
Bishop Dominique Tinoudji (born ) Bishop of Pala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManli, Diocese of Moundou
Ordained BishopSaints Pierre et Paul, Cathedral, Pala, Diocese of Pala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 22 Aug 2021
  • c2+: CB, 30 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Oct 2021

Quantcast