Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Thakur, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Muzaffarpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1937 Born
19 Mar 196629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Mar 198043.0AppointedBishop of Muzaffarpur, India
24 Jun 198043.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muzaffarpur, India
11 Jul 201477.4RetiredBishop of Muzaffarpur, India

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Thakur
Bishop John Baptist Thakur S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Muzaffarpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBettiah
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Bettiah

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Muzaffarpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast