Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William D’Souza, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Patna, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1946 Born
3 May 197630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 200559.7AppointedBishop of Buxar, India
25 Mar 200660.0Ordained BishopBishop of Buxar, India
1 Oct 200761.5AppointedArchbishop of Patna, India
9 Dec 202074.7ResignedArchbishop of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for William D’Souza
Archbishop William D’Souza S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Patna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadanthar
Ordained BishopMary Mother of Perpetual Help, Cathedral, Buxar, Diocese of Buxar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Patna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,095
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast