Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Aly Tagbino

Auxiliary Bishop of Kankan, Guinea

Titular Bishop of Cuicul

Apostolic Administrator of Kankan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1972 Born
2 Mar 200330.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kankan, Guinea
23 Dec 201644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kankan, Guinea
23 Dec 201644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
26 Feb 201744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuicul
10 Mar 202148.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kankan, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Alexis Aly Tagbino
Bishop Alexis Aly Tagbino (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kankan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuéckédou, Diocese of Kankan
Ordained BishopLe Centre de Formation Professionnelle Hô Chi Minh, Kankan, Diocese of Kankan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kankan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,343
  • aadm: CB, 10 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Mar 2021

Quantcast