Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Félémou

Deceased

Bishop of Kankan, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1960Born
19 Nov 198928.9Ordained PriestPriest of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
5 Jan 200746.0AppointedBishop of Kankan, Guinea
17 Mar 200746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kankan, Guinea
1 Mar 202160.1DiedBishop of Kankan, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Félémou
Bishop Emmanuel Félémou (born , died ) Bishop of Kankan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKolouma
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kankan, Diocese of Kankan

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,349
  • d: CB, 1 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast