Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Szymecki

Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1924 Born
3 May 194723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Katowice, Poland
3 Jul 194723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
27 Mar 198157.1AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
12 Apr 198157.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kielce, Poland
15 May 199369.3AppointedArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
16 Nov 200076.8RetiredArchbishop of Białystok, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Szymecki (VIAF: 101960758)
Archbishop Stanisław Szymecki (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatowice-Zaleska Halda, Diocese of Katowice
Ordained DeaconCollčge des Irlandais, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestCollčge des Irlandais, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Białystok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast