Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Odzimek

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Radom, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tadamata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1944 Born
31 May 196924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
3 Apr 198540.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland
3 Apr 198540.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
12 May 198540.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
25 Mar 199247.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland
7 Oct 201975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Odzimek
Bishop Adam Odzimek (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Radom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadom

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Radom.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast