Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Skucha

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sosnowiec, Poland

Titular Bishop of Segisama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1946 Born
14 Jun 197023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
18 Dec 198640.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
18 Dec 198640.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Segisama
15 Feb 198740.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segisama
25 Mar 199245.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
27 Jun 202175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sosnowiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Skucha
Bishop Piotr Skucha (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sosnowiec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁaganów, Diocese of Kielce
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kielce, Diocese of Kielce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sosnowiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,902
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast