Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yannis Spiteris, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1940 Born
10 Dec 196323.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jul 196827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Mar 200362.5AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
22 Mar 200362.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece
18 May 200362.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
14 Sep 202080.0RetiredArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
14 Sep 202080.0RetiredApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece

MicroData Summary for Yannis Spiteris
Archbishop Yannis Spiteris O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorf¨, Archdiocese of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Corf¨, Archdiocese of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,381
  • thes: CB, 17 Aug 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast