Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikólaos Foskolos

Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1936 Born
1 Oct 196124.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 197336.5AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
12 Aug 197336.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
1992²55.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece
12 Aug 201477.6RetiredArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
12 Aug 201477.6RetiredApostolic Administrator of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikólaos Foskolos
Archbishop Nikólaos Foskolos (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComi
Ordained BishopSaint Denis, Church, Athens, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast