Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franghískos Papamanólis, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1936 Born
29 Apr 196225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Jun 197437.5AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
27 Jun 197437.5AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
27 Jun 197437.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
20 Oct 197437.8Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 May 201477.4RetiredBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 May 201477.4RetiredBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
13 May 201477.4RetiredApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Franghískos Papamanólis
Bishop Franghískos Papamanólis O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAno Syros
Ordained BishopSt. George's, Cathedral, Syros, Diocese of Syros (e Milos)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Syros (e Milos).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast