Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luiz Soares Vieira

Archbishop Emeritus of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1937 Born
21 Feb 196022.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 198446.9AppointedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
1 Jul 198447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
13 Nov 199154.5AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Dec 201275.6RetiredArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Soares Vieira
Archbishop Luiz Soares Vieira (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manaus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConchas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Apucarana, Diocese of Apucarana, Parana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Manaus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast