Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Julien-Robert Mouisset

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1909Born
12 Mar 194939.8Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
5 Aug 196253.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nice, France
5 Aug 196253.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
29 Sep 196253.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
24 Apr 196353.9SucceededBishop of Nice, France
30 Apr 198475.0RetiredBishop of Nice, France
4 Jun 199384.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Julien-Robert Mouisset
Bishop Jean-Julien-Robert Mouisset (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSète, Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 162
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 499, Ascendance
  • opd/c1/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast