Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Gonzaga Silva Pepeu, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1957 Born
8 Dec 198225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Jun 200144.3AppointedBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
6 Oct 200144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
11 Jun 200851.3AppointedArchbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
9 Oct 201962.6ResignedArchbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luis Gonzaga Silva Pepeu
Archbishop Luis Gonzaga Silva Pepeu O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vitória da Conquista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaruaru
Ordained BishopGinásio do SESC, Caruaru

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,067
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast