Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Silva, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Summula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1962 Born
10 Jan 198825.0First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Oct 199128.8Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Dec 199128.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Aug 199229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Dec 202058.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
16 Dec 202058.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Summula
13 Feb 202158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summula

MicroData Summary for Carlos Silva
Bishop Carlos Silva O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndradina, Diocese of Lins, Sao Paulo
Ordained DeaconSão Francisco de Assis, Church, Nova Veneza, Diocese of Lins, Sao Paulo
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Church, Birigui, Diocese of Lins, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Assunção, Cathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Dec 2020
  • c3+: CB, 12 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast