Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
26 March 1960 | Erected | Diocese of Barra do Piraí (Nova Iguacú, Nilópolis, Itaguaí, Mangaratiba, district of Tairetá, and region Sertâo (Vassouras))
Diocese of Petrópolis (Our Lady of Graces, from St. John the Baptist and from St. Matthew in the city of St. John of Merit) | Diocese of Nova Iguaçu (erected) |
14 March 1980 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda (Angra dos Reis and Parati)
Diocese of Nova Iguaçu (Itaguai and Mangaratiba) | Diocese of Itaguaí (erected) |
11 October 1980 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Nova Iguaçu (São João de Meriti)
Diocese of Petrópolis (Duque de Caxias) | Diocese of Duque de Caxias (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1966 | 1,000,000 | .0% | 33 | 30 | 63 | 0 | 110 | 35 | ap1967 | |||
1968 | 1,200,000 | .0% | 38 | 35 | 73 | 0 | 35 | 104 | 38 | ap1971 | ||
1976 | 1,696,700 | 1,900,000 | 89.3% | 42 | 40 | 82 | 20,691 | 41 | 115 | 59 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 1,886,000 | 2,113,000 | 89.3% | 36 | 51 | 87 | 21,678 | 74 | 107 | 63 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 1,458,000 | 1,860,000 | 78.4% | 24 | 35 | 59 | 24,711 | 1 | 65 | 88 | 46 | ap1991 |
1999 | 1,020,000 | 1,700,000 | 60.0% | 27 | 46 | 73 | 13,972 | 12 | 63 | 78 | 47 | ap2000 |
2000 | 1,120,000 | 1,780,000 | 62.9% | 33 | 33 | 66 | 16,969 | 12 | 53 | 77 | 47 | ap2001 |
2001 | 1,260,000 | 1,800,000 | 70.0% | 33 | 41 | 74 | 17,027 | 12 | 62 | 73 | 48 | ap2002 |
2002 | 1,144,390 | 1,907,318 | 60.0% | 42 | 68 | 110 | 10,403 | 15 | 91 | 77 | 50 | ap2003 |
2003 | 1,144,390 | 1,961,302 | 58.3% | 36 | 71 | 107 | 10,695 | 13 | 94 | 79 | 50 | ap2004 |
2004 | 1,023,000 | 1,755,770 | 58.3% | 34 | 29 | 63 | 16,238 | 16 | 52 | 84 | 50 | ap2005 |
2013 | 1,280,000 | 1,889,705 | 67.7% | 52 | 33 | 85 | 15,058 | 26 | 40 | 75 | 50 | ap2014 |
2016 | 1,311,000 | 1,892,701 | 69.3% | 49 | 33 | 82 | 15,987 | 28 | 39 | 68 | 50 | ap2017 |
2019 | 1,364,950 | 1,970,418 | 69.3% | 53 | 36 | 89 | 15,336 | 29 | 37 | 67 | 52 | ap2020 |
2021 | 1,374,980 | 1,985,248 | 69.3% | 49 | 32 | 81 | 16,975 | 31 | 37 | 65 | 52 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 5 Jun 2023 |
✠