Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Fortune Sanchez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1934Born
20 Dec 195925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
1 Jun 197440.1AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
25 Jul 197440.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
6 Apr 199359.0ResignedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
20 Jan 201277.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Fortune Sanchez
Archbishop Robert Fortune Sanchez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSocorro
Ordained BishopAlbuquerque Sports Stadium, Albuquerque

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,515

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast