Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard John Sklba

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1935 Born
20 Dec 195924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
6 Nov 197944.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
6 Nov 197944.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castro di Puglia
19 Dec 197944.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castro di Puglia
18 Oct 201075.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard John Sklba
Bishop Richard John Sklba (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRacine
Ordained BishopMilwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milwaukee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast