Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ven. Alphonse Paul Gallegos, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Sasabe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1931Born
24 May 195827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
24 Aug 198150.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
24 Aug 198150.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasabe
4 Nov 198150.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasabe
6 Oct 199160.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Ven. Alphonse Paul Gallegos (VIAF: 1895398)
Bishop Ven. Alphonse Paul Gallegos O.A.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbuquerque, NM
Ordained BishopHoly Sacrament, Cathedral, Sacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ven: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2016
  • mn: CB, 10 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast