Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aurelio Cardinal Sabattani

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1912Born
28 Oct 193422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Faenza, Italy
26 Jul 193522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
24 Jun 196552.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iustiniana Prima
24 Jun 196552.6AppointedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
25 Jul 196552.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iustiniana Prima
13 Jul 197158.7AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
30 Sep 197158.9ResignedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
17 May 198269.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
2 Feb 198370.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
2 Feb 198370.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Feb 198370.2AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
8 Feb 198370.3AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
8 Feb 198370.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
1 Jul 198875.7RetiredPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
1 Jul 199178.7RetiredPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
1 Jul 199178.7RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
5 Apr 199380.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
19 Apr 200390.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Sabattani
Aurelio Cardinal Sabattani (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasal Fiumanese, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained DeaconCathedral Basilica, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza, Italy
Ordained PriestEpiscopal, Chapel, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceResidence, Palazzo del Tribunale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Riolo Terme

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Feb 1983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast