Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro de Faria

Bishop Emeritus of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1930 Born
22 Sep 195626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Funchal, Portugal
10 Mar 198251.5AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
16 May 198251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
8 Mar 200776.5RetiredBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Teodoro de Faria
Bishop Teodoro de Faria (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoliqueme Santo Antônio
Ordained BishopSt. Antoine des Portugais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Funchal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast