Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Rüth, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Amudarsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1899Born
6 Jul 192424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
4 Feb 195353.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
4 Feb 195353.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
12 Apr 195353.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
25 Mar 197474.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
17 Feb 197878.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}

MicroData Summary for Johannes Rüth (VIAF: 3479346)
Bishop Johannes Rüth SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorhausen
Ordained BishopSaint Olav, Church, Trondheim, Vicariate Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
Death PlaceMechernich, Germany

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast