Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Knut Ansgar Nelson, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden

Titular Bishop of Dura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1906Born
30 May 193225.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
30 May 193528.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 May 193730.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 194740.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Sweden
12 Jul 194740.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
8 Sep 194740.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
29 Jun 195346.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden
1 Aug 195750.8SucceededBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
2 Jul 196255.7ResignedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
2 Jul 196255.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
31 Mar 199083.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Knut Ansgar Nelson
Bishop Knut Ansgar Nelson O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrederiksvaerk, Denmark

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 90
  • prof/sole: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast