Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Séraphin François Rouamba

Archbishop Emeritus of Koupéla, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1942 Born
27 Jun 197028.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 199553.4AppointedBishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
21 Oct 199553.8Ordained BishopBishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
5 Dec 200058.9AppointedArchbishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
7 Dec 201977.9RetiredArchbishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Séraphin François Rouamba
Archbishop Séraphin François Rouamba (born 1942) Archbishop Emeritus of Koupéla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuagadougou
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame des Grâces, Cathedral, Koupéla, Diocese of Koupéla

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Koupéla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,625
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast