Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ouagadougou

Archidioecesis Uagaduguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 9,600 (3,708 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archevêché, 01 B.P. 1472, Ouagadougou 01, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 25.30.67.05

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
2 July 1921SplitVicariate Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese} Vicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
11 January 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou Prefecture Apostolic of Navrongo (erected)
15 December 1927Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso (erected)
9 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou (Dagari de Niego and Dagari de Bozo) Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
9 June 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou (Parts in Algeria)
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao (erected) (San and Tougan, Gourma-Rharous and Gao, of Goundam (upto 20th parallel line) and of Issaber or NiafounJcé, and Tombouctou (upto 20th parallel line), and Mopti)
9 June 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
12 June 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou (Ouahigouya and Koudougon) Prefecture Apostolic of Ouahigouya (erected)
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
20 February 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Ouagadougou (Tenkodogo and Zorgo) Diocese of Koupéla (erected)
19 December 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Ouagadougou (Leo) Diocese of Koudougou
26 June 1969Territory LostDiocese of Koupéla
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
Diocese of Kaya (erected) (Kayana)
2 January 1997Territory LostDiocese of Koupéla
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
Diocese of Manga (erected) (Boulgou, Bazega, Zoundweogo, and Nahouri)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
195022,870980,2152.3%1243554155609ap1951
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
197066,7671,127,3325.9%36407687810415115ap1971
1978132,457929,48414.3%4438821,6158218315ap1981
1990241,7161,444,04616.7%5939982,46611321517ap1991
1999327,7581,532,95021.4%87481352,42716831516ap2000
2000418,4821,588,63726.3%69481173,57616526315ap2001
2001357,8321,649,82021.7%88541422,51919838315ap2002
2002378,4981,946,82019.4%97501472,574116737717ap2003
2003392,9831,946,82020.2%97551522,58528442317ap2004
2004442,1621,946,82022.7%103641672,64730045117ap2005
2013851,4142,495,00034.1%105871924,43435840923ap2014
2016907,5672,740,13933.1%1271132403,78139559428ap2017
20191,017,8003,006,00033.9%1271142414,22343651431ap2020
20211,078,7003,188,00033.8%1331472803,85244651134ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 34, Page 301
  • Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 19 Feb 2024