Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Oscar Arnulfo Romero y Galdamez

Deceased

Archbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1917Born
4 Apr 194224.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 197052.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
25 Apr 197052.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tambeae
21 Jun 197052.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tambeae
15 Oct 197457.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
3 Feb 197759.4AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
22 Feb 197759.5InstalledArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
24 Mar 198062.6DiedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
23 May 2015Beatified
14 Oct 2018Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Oscar Arnulfo Romero y Galdamez
Archbishop St. Oscar Arnulfo Romero y Galdamez (born , died ) Archbishop of San Salvador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Barrios
Ordained BishopSan Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • beat: CB, 21 May 2015
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • cano: Bollettino, 19 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 739

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast