Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Joseph Rodimer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paterson, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1927Born
19 May 195123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
5 Dec 197750.1AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
28 Feb 197850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
1 Jun 200476.6RetiredBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
6 Dec 201891.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Frank Joseph Rodimer (VIAF: 21765656)
Bishop Frank Joseph Rodimer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paterson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRockaway
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Paterson, Diocese of Paterson, New Jersey
Death PlaceTotowa, NJ
Buried Place (Original)Calvary, Cemetery, Paterson, Diocese of Paterson, New Jersey

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Dec 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast